IN SB0422 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 127
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 127
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Family friendly school designation.
Title
Family friendly school designation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 127 |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-04-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 460: yeas 45, nays 4 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Motion to concur in House amendments filed |
2013-03-19 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2013-03-19 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 298: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2013-03-14 | House | Amendment 1 (Behning), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-03-14 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-03-12 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-03-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Cosponsor: Rep. V. Smith |
2013-02-26 | Senate | House sponsor: Rep. Behning |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 230: yeas 43 and nays 7 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Senator Banks added as third author |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as second author |
2013-01-10 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Authored by Senator Rogers |