IN SB0420 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-27 - Third reading: defeated; Roll Call 256: yeas 24, nays 71
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-27 - Third reading: defeated; Roll Call 256: yeas 24, nays 71
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Credit services organizations. Amends the definition of the term "credit services organization" for purposes of the Indiana Code provisions governing credit services organizations to more closely align the definition with the definition of "credit repair organization" set forth in the federal Credit Repair Organizations Act. Makes a conforming amendment to the definition of the term "buyer" in the Indiana statute. Requires a credit services organization to do the following with respect to communications made by the credit services organization after June 30, 2018: (1) Include the complete name and address of the credit services organization on all communications. (2) Include
Title
Credit services organizations. Amends the definition of the term "credit services organization" for purposes of the Indiana Code provisions governing credit services organizations to more closely align the definition with the definition of "credit repair organization" set forth in the federal Credit Repair Organizations Act. Makes a conforming amendment to the definition of the term "buyer" in the Indiana statute. Requires a credit services organization to do the following with respect to communications made by the credit services organization after June 30, 2018: (1) Include the complete name and address of the credit services organization on all communications. (2) Include
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 24 N: 71 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | House | Third reading: defeated; Roll Call 256: yeas 24, nays 71 |
2018-02-26 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-02-22 | House | Representative Ellington added as cosponsor |
2018-02-22 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-02-12 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2018-02-05 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Burton |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 148: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Perfect) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Senator Holdman added as second author |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Authored by Senator Perfect |