IN SB0414 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 126
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Provisions related to high breast density.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provisions related to high breast density.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-15 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House - Roll Call 320 (Y: 61 N: 29 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-13HousePublic Law 126
2013-04-30SenateSigned by the Governor
2013-04-22SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2013-04-18HouseSigned by the Speaker
2013-04-17SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2013-04-15SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 478: yeas 48, nays 0
2013-04-01SenateMotion to concur in House amendments filed
2013-03-26HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2013-03-26HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 351: yeas 95, nays 1
2013-03-25HouseRepresentatives Negele, Mayfield and Austin added as cosponsors
2013-03-25HouseHouse Rule 105.1 suspended
2013-03-25HouseRuling of the Chair appealed. Ruling sustained; Roll Call 320: yeas 61, nays 29
2013-03-25HouseAmendment 3 (Candelaria Reardon), ruled out of order
2013-03-25HouseAmendment 1 (Crouch), prevailed; voice vote
2013-03-25HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2013-03-21HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-03-12HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Insurance
2013-02-19SenateSenators Breaux and Wyss added as coauthors
2013-02-19SenateCosponsors: Reps. C. Brown and Zent
2013-02-19SenateHouse sponsor: Rep. Crouch
2013-02-19SenateReferred to the House
2013-02-19SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 158: yeas 49 and nays 0
2013-02-18SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-02-14SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-02-12SenateSenator Stoops added as coauthor
2013-02-12SenateSenator Leising added as third author
2013-02-07SenateSenator Becker added as second author
2013-01-10SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2013-01-10SenateAuthored by Senator Pat Miller

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback