IN SB0408 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-14 - First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
Pending: Senate Health and Provider Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Childhood obesity report. Requires the state department of health (state department) and the department of education to: (1) before August 1, 2019, provide specified information concerning childhood obesity to the management performance hub; and (2) before September 1, 2019, submit a written report summarizing the information to the public health, behavioral health, and human services interim study committee (interim study committee). Requires, before July 1, 2020, the state department to report outcomes of Indiana's Comprehensive Nutrition and Physical Activity Plan, 2010-2020 to the interim study committee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Childhood obesity report. Requires the state department of health (state department) and the department of education to: (1) before August 1, 2019, provide specified information concerning childhood obesity to the management performance hub; and (2) before September 1, 2019, submit a written report summarizing the information to the public health, behavioral health, and human services interim study committee (interim study committee). Requires, before July 1, 2020, the state department to report outcomes of Indiana's Comprehensive Nutrition and Physical Activity Plan, 2010-2020 to the interim study committee.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-14SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2019-01-14SenateAuthored by Senator Spartz

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback