IN SB0408 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - Public Law 110
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - Public Law 110
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Defines "neonatal abstinence syndrome" (NAS). Requires the state department of health to: (1) meet with representatives of certain associations to study and make recommendations on issues concerning NAS; and (2) report, before November 1, 2014, on certain issues concerning NAS to the legislative council for distribution to the appropriate interim study committee. Allows the state department of health to establish, before June 1, 2015, one or more pilot programs with hospitals that consent to participate in the programs to implement appropriate and effective models for NAS identification, data collection, and reporting.
Title
Neonatal abstinence syndrome.
Sponsors
Sen. Vaneta Becker [R] | Sen. Patricia Miller [R] | Sen. Jean Breaux [D] | Sen. Jean Leising [R] |
Sen. Brent Steele [R] | Rep. Gail Riecken [D] | Rep. Ronald Bacon [R] | Rep. David Frizzell [R] |
Rep. Karlee Macer [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Floor - (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House Floor - (Y: 80 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs - Roll Call 040802 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health and Provider Services - Roll Call 040801 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Floor - (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House Floor - (Y: 80 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs - Roll Call 040802 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health and Provider Services - Roll Call 040801 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | Senate | Public Law 110 |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-03-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senator Steele added as coauthor. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 417: yeas 46 and nays 0 |
2014-03-12 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 476: yeas 98 and nays 0 |
2014-03-05 | House | Representative Macer added as advisor |
2014-03-05 | House | Representative M. Smith added as advisor |
2014-03-05 | House | Representative Bacon added as advisor |
2014-03-05 | House | Representative Riecken added as conferee |
2014-03-05 | House | Representative Kubacki added as conferee |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senator Leising added as advisor |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as advisor |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senator Pat Miller added as advisor |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senator Breaux added as conferee |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senator Becker added as conferee |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2014-03-03 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2014-03-03 | House | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 346: yeas 98 and nays 0 |
2014-02-26 | House | SB 408 Amendment #1 (Riecken), prevailed. |
2014-02-26 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed. |
2014-02-24 | House | Representative Macer added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-24 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-10 | House | First Reading: Referred to Family, Children and Human Affairs |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Representative Frizzell added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Representative Bacon added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Representative Riecken added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Representative Kubacki added as sponsor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 194: yeas 47 and nays 0 |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Senator Leising added as coauthor. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Senator Breaux added as coauthor. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Health and Provider Services |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senator Becker, Miller Patricia. |