IN SB0405 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-28 - First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-28 - First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Offenses committed by incarcerated individuals. Provides that the knowing or intentional possession of: (1) a cellular telephone; (2) storage media; (3) a subscriber identity module or SIM card; or (4) any other cellular or wireless communications device; while incarcerated in a jail or state penal facility is a Class A misdemeanor. Provides that a person convicted of a misdemeanor offense may be committed to the department of correction for an executed sentence if the person was serving a prior, unrelated sentence at the department of correction when the misdemeanor was committed. Provides that a person convicted of a Level 6
Title
Offenses committed by incarcerated individuals. Provides that the knowing or intentional possession of: (1) a cellular telephone; (2) storage media; (3) a subscriber identity module or SIM card; or (4) any other cellular or wireless communications device; while incarcerated in a jail or state penal facility is a Class A misdemeanor. Provides that a person convicted of a misdemeanor offense may be committed to the department of correction for an executed sentence if the person was serving a prior, unrelated sentence at the department of correction when the misdemeanor was committed. Provides that a person convicted of a Level 6
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2017-02-14 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Steuerwald |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 121: yeas 48, nays 2 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senator Taylor G added as coauthor |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Senator Head added as second author |
2017-01-10 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Authored by Senator Houchin |