IN SB0405 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Senator Head added as coauthor
Pending: Senate Tax and Fiscal Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Senator Head added as coauthor
Pending: Senate Tax and Fiscal Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Assessment of agricultural land. Provides that the soil productivity factors used for the March 1, 2011, assessment of agricultural land must be used for assessment dates occurring after March 1, 2014, unless and until new soil productivity factors are approved in a statute enacted by the general assembly. Specifies the manner in which the department of local government finance (DLGF) shall adopt rules to provide a method for determining the true tax value of agricultural land. Provides that the method in effect for the 2014 assessment date must be used until superseded by a method provided in rules adopted by
Title
Assessment of agricultural land. Provides that the soil productivity factors used for the March 1, 2011, assessment of agricultural land must be used for assessment dates occurring after March 1, 2014, unless and until new soil productivity factors are approved in a statute enacted by the general assembly. Specifies the manner in which the department of local government finance (DLGF) shall adopt rules to provide a method for determining the true tax value of agricultural land. Provides that the method in effect for the 2014 assessment date must be used until superseded by a method provided in rules adopted by
Sponsors
Sen. Jean Leising [R] | Sen. Susan Glick [R] | Sen. Jeff Raatz [R] | Sen. Brent Steele [R] |
Sen. James Tomes [R] | Sen. Mark Messmer [R] | Sen. Michael Crider [R] | Sen. Clyde Perfect [R] |
Sen. Randall Head [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | Senate | Senator Head added as coauthor |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Senators Crider and Perfect added as coauthor |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Senators Steele, Tomes, Messmer added as coauthors |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Senator Raatz added as third author |
2015-01-12 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Authored by Senators Leising and Glick |