IN SB0397 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the office of Medicaid policy and planning to reimburse in a specified manner for a specialized or nonstandard wheelchair for a child recipient who resides in a nursing facility.
Title
Medicaid reimbursement for wheelchairs for children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Concur in House Amendments (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Floor - (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House Committee on Public Health - Roll Call 039703 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health and Provider Services - Roll Call 039701 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Floor - (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House Committee on Public Health - Roll Call 039703 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health and Provider Services - Roll Call 039701 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Public Law 108 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Motion to Concur in House Amendments: prevailed; Roll Call 364: yeas 49 and nays 0 |
2014-03-03 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2014-03-03 | House | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 348: yeas 97 and nays 0 |
2014-02-26 | House | Second reading: engrossed. |
2014-02-24 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-17 | House | Representative C. Brown added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-10 | House | First Reading: Referred to Public Health |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Representative Saunders added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Representative Ziemke added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Representative Eberhart added sponsor. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 127: yeas 48 and nays 0 |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2014-01-30 | Senate | SB 397 Amendment #3 (Leising), prevailed. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Senator Breaux added as coauthor. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as coauthor. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Senator Stoops added as coauthor. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as third author. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Senator Pat Miller added as second author. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Committee Report; do pass, adopted |
2014-01-14 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Health and Provider Services |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senator Leising. |