IN SB0396 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Public Law 103
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

1977 pension and disability fund. Amends the definition of "salary of a first class patrolman or first class firefighter" for the purpose of benefits paid from and contributions made to the 1977 police officers' and firefighters' pension and disability fund (fund). Establishes certain requirements if an employer certifies a new salary under IC 36-8-8-6.5. Changes the maximum age for an applicant to a police department from 35 to 39 years of age. Requires an employer that participates in the fund and provides longevity increases to pay an amount greater than or equal to the longevity increase paid in the previous year. Requires employers to provide reports or records requested by the system board, and permits the system board to fine the employer for each day that reports or records are late. Provides that an alleged failure of an employer to make required payments to the 1977 fund may be examined by the state board of accounts or by the Indiana public retirement system. Requires employers to submit, both annually and at the request of the system board, the salary of a first class patrolman or firefighter.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

1977 pension and disability fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-22SenatePublic Law 103
2021-04-22SenateSigned by the Governor
2021-04-21SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-04-13HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-04-12SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-04-05SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 345: yeas 47, nays 0
2021-04-01SenateMotion to concur filed
2021-03-31HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2021-03-30HouseRepresentative Ellington added as cosponsor
2021-03-30HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 337: yeas 93, nays 0
2021-03-29HouseRepresentative Andrade M added as cosponsor
2021-03-29HouseRepresentative Bartels added as cosponsor
2021-03-29HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-03-25HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-03-04HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
2021-02-24SenateReferred to the House
2021-02-23SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2021-02-23SenateSenator Buck added as coauthor
2021-02-23SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Frye R
2021-02-23SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 201: yeas 46, nays 0
2021-02-22SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-02-22SenateSenator Tallian added as third author
2021-02-22SenateSenator Brown L added as second author
2021-02-18SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-02-11SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
2021-01-14SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor
2021-01-14SenateAuthored by Senator Boots

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/senate/396/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/8/8/0/c880028d/SB0396.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/f/2/c/ff2c6156/SB0396.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/9/f/c/39fcb54b/SB0396.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/5/d/0/d5d0e8e7/SB0396.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/2/2/d/e22dc7fd/SB0396.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/e/9/0/fe90fbcf/SB0396.04.ENRH.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/2/6/f/e26f03bf/SB0396.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/3/5/8/c3584cec/SB0396.02.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/d/5/1/7d51f5ef/SB0396.01.INTR.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/1/0/a/b10a2f16/SB0396.02.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/b/1/5/6b15df98/SB0396.02.COMS.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/5/4/0/854041c6/SB0396.02.COMS.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/f/f/1/2ff1f8d7/SB0396.03.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/a/c/c/bacc9ef1/SB0396.03.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/4/8/1/348187c9/SB0396.03.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/5/3/6/b536a5d7/SB0396.03.COMH.CON01.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/d/f/3/5df3328a/SB0396.04.ENRH.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/5/3/9/25390663/SB0396.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/f/d/d/afdd4b50/SB0396.201_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/7/6/d/076dc490/SB0396.02.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/a/0/0/7a005899/SB0396.337_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/f/a/2/dfa26849/SB0396.345_S.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback