IN SB0394 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-24 - Public Law 65
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-24 - Public Law 65
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Makes various changes to consumer protection provisions enforced by the attorney general, including: (1) enforcement of investigative demands by the attorney general; (2) acceptance of written assurance of voluntary compliance for certain violations concerning nonprofit corporations; and (3) changes to the definition of "consumer transaction" and to acts, omissions, and practices by a supplier that are prohibited in connection with consumer transactions for purposes of the deceptive consumer sales law.
Title
Consumer protection.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Bray [R] | Sen. Joseph Zakas [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Sen. Karen Tallian [D] |
Rep. Judson McMillin [R] | Sen. Mark Messmer [R] | Rep. Christina Hale [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Concur in House Amendments (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House Floor - (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House Floor - (Y: 88 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House Floor - (Y: 65 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House Floor - (Y: 64 N: 30 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House Committee on Commerce, Small Business and Economic Development - Roll Call 039403 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Civil Law - Roll Call 039401 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House Floor - (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House Floor - (Y: 88 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House Floor - (Y: 65 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House Floor - (Y: 64 N: 30 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House Committee on Commerce, Small Business and Economic Development - Roll Call 039403 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Civil Law - Roll Call 039401 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-24 | Senate | Public Law 65 |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Motion to Concur in House Amendments: prevailed; Roll Call 373: yeas 41 and nays 0 |
2014-02-24 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2014-02-24 | House | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 267: yeas 96 and nays 1 |
2014-02-20 | House | Representative Hale added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-18 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed. |
2014-02-18 | House | SB 394 Amendment #4 (Pryor) motion ruled out of order. |
2014-02-18 | House | SB 394 Amendment #3 (Pelath) motion ruled out of order. |
2014-02-18 | House | SB 394 Amendment #5 (Forestal), prevailed. |
2014-02-17 | House | Representative Messmer added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-13 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-10 | House | First Reading: Referred to Commerce, Small Business and Economic Development |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as third author. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Representative McMillin added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Representative Torr added sponsor. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 125: yeas 48 and nays 0 |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2014-01-30 | Senate | SB 394 Amendment #1 (Head), prevailed. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Senator Tallian added as coauthor. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Civil Law |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bray, Zakas. |