IN SB0393 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Public Law 188
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Charity gaming. Allows the Indiana gaming commission (commission) to issue annual casino night licenses to certain bona fide civic organizations. Limits the number of bona fide civic organizations that may hold an annual casino night license to one in each county and establishes criteria for the commission to apply in awarding a license. Removes requirements that certain operators be a resident of Indiana. Provides requirements for an operator of a qualified organization. Specifies that a license is valid for two years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Charity gaming. Allows the Indiana gaming commission (commission) to issue annual casino night licenses to certain bona fide civic organizations. Limits the number of bona fide civic organizations that may hold an annual casino night license to one in each county and establishes criteria for the commission to apply in awarding a license. Removes requirements that certain operators be a resident of Indiana. Provides requirements for an operator of a qualified organization. Specifies that a license is valid for two years.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 89 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 86 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02SenatePublic Law 188
2019-05-02SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-29HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-24SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-24HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 624: yeas 89, nays 4
2019-04-24SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 589: yeas 45, nays 4
2019-04-23HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2019-04-23SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2019-04-23SenateSenator Alting added as conferee
2019-04-23SenateSenator Lanane removed as conferee
2019-04-23SenateSenator Alting removed as advisor
2019-04-18HouseHouse advisors appointed: Smaltz, Manning and Summers
2019-04-18HouseHouse conferees appointed: Clere and Moed
2019-04-18SenateSenate advisors appointed: Alting, Taylor G and Bohacek
2019-04-18SenateSenate conferees appointed: Houchin and Lanane
2019-04-18SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2019-04-17SenateMotion to dissent filed
2019-04-12HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2019-04-11HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 487: yeas 86, nays 6
2019-04-10HouseAmendment #1 (Clere) prevailed; voice vote
2019-04-10HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-04-08HouseRepresentative Manning added as cosponsor
2019-04-04HouseRepresentative Manning removed as cosponsor
2019-04-04HouseRepresentative Smaltz added as cosponsor
2019-04-04HouseRepresentative Clere removed as cosponsor
2019-04-04HouseRepresentative Clere added as sponsor
2019-04-04HouseRepresentative Smaltz removed as sponsor
2019-04-04HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-02-26HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
2019-02-20SenateReferred to the House
2019-02-18SenateCosponsors: Representatives Clere and Manning
2019-02-18SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Smaltz
2019-02-18SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 141: yeas 47, nays 2
2019-02-14SenateAmendment #1 (Houchin) prevailed; voice vote
2019-02-14SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-02-04SenateSenator Bohacek added as coauthor
2019-01-31SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2019-01-31SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-01-28SenateSenator Alting added as second author
2019-01-14SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
2019-01-14SenateAuthored by Senator Houchin

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/senate/393/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/f/f/0/aff0e4ff/SB0393.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/b/3/b/0b3bb439/SB0393.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/d/3/5/8d35fb06/SB0393.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/2/0/2/22027924/SB0393.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/c/f/6/2cf6ec36/SB0393.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/e/4/3/de43bddc/SB0393.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/0/a/1/90a11e30/SB0393.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/3/7/f/237f60bc/SB0393.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/7/5/7/d75799f2/SB0393.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/8/1/a/281af374/SB0393.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/1/3/9/11393e3a/SB0393.06.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/e/b/f/1ebf0e02/SB0393.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/6/5/a/065a45bb/SB0393.141.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/4/a/7/84a78c1a/SB0393.03.ENGS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/8/9/7/58974703/SB0393.487.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/7/4/7/d7477147/SB0393.624.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/2/b/6/e2b67da4/SB0393.589.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback