IN SB0392 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-28 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-28 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
University housing for single mothers. Provides that the commission for higher education may administer a program to support JobSource, Inc., for the management of the Heartland/Anderson Scholar House. Provides that the purposes of the program include: (1) the expansion of program participant services; (2) residential and other support facility improvements and a one time debt reduction of $250,000; (3) outreach to impoverished single mothers in minority communities; and (4) the provision of a scholarship gap fund for graduates staying in Indiana. Provides that administration costs incurred in the management of the Heartland/Anderson Scholar House may not exceed two percent 2% of the total program costs
Title
University housing for single mothers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-28 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Senator Alexander added as coauthor |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives DeVon, Pierce K, Rowray E |
2023-01-31 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Davis |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 56: yeas 48, nays 1 |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Senators Qaddoura and Niezgodski added as coauthors |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Senators Charbonneau, Busch, Crider, Raatz added as coauthors |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Senators Ford Jon and Niemeyer added as coauthors |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Senators Brown L and Rogers added as coauthors |
2023-01-19 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Authored by Senators Gaskill, Garten, Bassler |
Subjects
BUDGETS AND APPROPRIATIONS
EDUCATION, Secretary of Education, State Department and Boards
HIGHER EDUCATION, Colleges and Universities
MINORITIES AND MINORITY BUSINESSES
STUDENT ASSISTANCE, LOANS, AND GRANTS
WOMEN'S ISSUES
EDUCATION, Secretary of Education, State Department and Boards
HIGHER EDUCATION, Colleges and Universities
MINORITIES AND MINORITY BUSINESSES
STUDENT ASSISTANCE, LOANS, AND GRANTS
WOMEN'S ISSUES