IN SB0386 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Public Law 61
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Public Law 61
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Financing of flood control improvements. Authorizes the Indianapolis metropolitan development commission (commission), following a written recommendation from the board of public works and approval of the legislative body, to adopt an ordinance designating an area as a flood control improvement district (district) to capture incremental property tax revenue within the district to be used for the construction, replacement, repair, maintenance, or improvement of flood control works. Provides that only special flood hazard property may be included within the boundaries of a district. Defines "special flood hazard property" as property that on January 1, 2018, is situated in a special flood
Title
Financing of flood control improvements. Authorizes the Indianapolis metropolitan development commission (commission), following a written recommendation from the board of public works and approval of the legislative body, to adopt an ordinance designating an area as a flood control improvement district (district) to capture incremental property tax revenue within the district to be used for the construction, replacement, repair, maintenance, or improvement of flood control works. Provides that only special flood hazard property may be included within the boundaries of a district. Defines "special flood hazard property" as property that on January 1, 2018, is situated in a special flood
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | Senate | Public Law 61 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2018-03-02 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2018-03-01 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 290: yeas 97, nays 0 |
2018-02-28 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-02-22 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-02-19 | House | Representative Huston added as cosponsor |
2018-02-19 | House | Representative Porter removed as cosponsor |
2018-02-19 | House | Representative Porter added as sponsor |
2018-02-19 | House | Representative Huston removed as sponsor |
2018-02-12 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Moed, Frizzell and Porter |
2018-02-06 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Huston |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 185: yeas 39, nays 8 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Senator Taylor G added as coauthor |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Senator Buck added as coauthor |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Senator Niezgodski added as third author |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as second author |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Senator Bohacek added as coauthor |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2018-01-08 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Authored by Senator Ruckelshaus |