IN SB0382 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Public Law 78
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Public Law 78
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Entrepreneur and enterprise district pilot program. Extends the duration of the entrepreneur and enterprise district pilot program (program) until the later of: (1) five years after the date on which it is designated as a district; or (2) December 31, 2024. (Currently, the program is set to expire in 2022.) Requires specific reporting requirements for the program established in the city of Fort Wayne.
Title
Entrepreneur and enterprise district pilot program.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Buchanan [R] | Sen. Ronnie Alting [R] | Sen. Fady Qaddoura [D] | Rep. Sharon Negele [R] |
Rep. Timothy Brown [R] | Rep. Chris Campbell [D] | Rep. Sheila Klinker [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | Senate | Public Law 78 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 364: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2021-03-24 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2021-03-23 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 297: yeas 93, nays 2 |
2021-03-22 | House | Representative Klinker added as cosponsor |
2021-03-22 | House | Amendment #1 (GiaQuinta) prevailed; voice vote |
2021-03-22 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2021-03-16 | House | Representative Campbell added as cosponsor |
2021-03-11 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2021-03-02 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Brown, T. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Negele |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 60: yeas 45, nays 0 |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Senator Qaddoura added as coauthor |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Brown L) prevailed; voice vote |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2021-01-14 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senators Buchanan and Alting |