IN SB0378 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on February 27 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 27 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the board of directors of a conservancy district (board) to enter into contracts with local governmental agencies for purposes of implementing the district plan. (Current law permits such contracts with a person or a federal or state agency.) Adds security of any part of the district as a purpose for which the board may enter into such a contract. (Current law permits contracts for construction, maintenance, or operation of any part of the district.)
Title
Conservancy district contracts.
Sponsors
Sen. Vi Simpson [D] | Sen. Greg Walker [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-27 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-03-09 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2012-03-08 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2012-03-08 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2012-02-27 | Returned to the Senate without amendments | |
2012-02-27 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 250: yeas 96, nays 0 | |
2012-02-23 | Representative Steuerwald added as cosponsor | |
2012-02-23 | Representative Thompson added as sponsor | |
2012-02-23 | Representative Thompson removed as cosponsor | |
2012-02-23 | Representative Steuerwald removed as sponsor | |
2012-02-23 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-02-20 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2012-02-13 | Representative Thompson added as cosponsor | |
2012-02-13 | First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources | |
2012-02-01 | Cosponsor: Rep. Welch | |
2012-02-01 | House sponsor: Rep. Steuerwald | |
2012-02-01 | Referred to the House | |
2012-02-01 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 180: yeas 49 and nays 0 | |
2012-01-26 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-24 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-20 | Senator Walker added as second author | |
2012-01-09 | First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources | |
2012-01-09 | Authored by Senator Simpson |