IN SB0376 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Public Law 136
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Public Law 136
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Gaming matters. Defines a "charitable government services organization". Provides that a charitable government services organization and other specified individuals may accept payment by credit card for the purchase of a chance to enter a raffle or water race offered at an allowable activity if the transaction satisfies particular requirements.
Title
Gaming matters.
Sponsors
Sen. Justin Busch [R] | Sen. Jon Ford [R] | Sen. Vaneta Becker [R] | Sen. Jean Breaux [D] |
Sen. Linda Rogers [R] | Sen. Eddie Melton [D] | Rep. Martin Carbaugh [R] | Rep. Philip GiaQuinta [D] |
Rep. Matthew Lehman [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Public Law 136 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2022-03-07 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 349: yeas 91, nays 2 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 341: yeas 41, nays 9 |
2022-03-03 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2022-03-03 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2022-03-02 | House | House advisors appointed: Lehman, Hostettler and Moed |
2022-03-02 | House | House conferees appointed: Carbaugh and GiaQuinta |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Ford Jon and Pol |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Busch and Breaux |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Motion to dissent filed |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Concurrence withdrawn |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2022-03-01 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2022-02-28 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 287: yeas 92, nays 1 |
2022-02-24 | House | Amendment #1 (Bartels) prevailed; voice vote |
2022-02-24 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2022-02-23 | House | Representative Lehman added as cosponsor |
2022-02-22 | House | Representative GiaQuinta added as cosponsor |
2022-02-22 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-02-08 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senator Melton added as coauthor |
2022-02-01 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Carbaugh |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 184: yeas 39, nays 10 |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as coauthor |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Senator Ford Jon added as second author |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Senators Becker and Breaux added as coauthors |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-01-11 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Authored by Senator Busch |