IN SB0375 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - Public Law 106
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - Public Law 106
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that the following are not securities subject to IC 23: (1) A venture capital investment tax credit. (2) A certificate from the Indiana economic development corporation indicating that a taxpayer has fulfilled the requirements of the corporation and is entitled to a venture capital investment tax credit. Defines "accredited investor" for the purposes of the Uniform Securities Act. Adds exemptions to the Uniform Securities Act for certain transactions.
Title
Business financing arrangements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House Floor - (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House Committee on Financial Institutions - Roll Call 037503 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy - Roll Call 037502 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce, Economic Development & Technology - Roll Call 037501 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House Floor - (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House Committee on Financial Institutions - Roll Call 037503 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy - Roll Call 037502 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce, Economic Development & Technology - Roll Call 037501 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | Senate | Public Law 106 |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2014-03-12 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 460: yeas 96 and nays 1 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 395: yeas 44 and nays 0 |
2014-03-04 | House | Representative DeLaney added as advisor |
2014-03-04 | House | Representative Hale added as advisor |
2014-03-04 | House | Representative Thompson added as advisor |
2014-03-04 | House | Representative Cherry added as advisor |
2014-03-04 | House | Representative Shackleford added as conferee |
2014-03-04 | House | Representative Heuer added as conferee |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senator Mrvan added as advisor |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senator Head added as advisor |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senator Taylor added as conferee |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senator Holdman added as conferee |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2014-02-26 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2014-02-26 | House | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 309: yeas 89 and nays 3 |
2014-02-25 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed. |
2014-02-25 | House | SB 375 Amendment #4 (DeLaney), prevailed. |
2014-02-25 | House | SB 375 Amendment #2 (Heuer), prevailed. |
2014-02-24 | House | Representative Ober added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-24 | House | Representative Hale added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-20 | House | Representative Shackleford added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-20 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-17 | House | Reassigned to Financial Institutions |
2014-02-10 | House | First Reading: Referred to Ways and Means |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Representative Davisson added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Representative Heuer added sponsor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 187: yeas 47 and nays 1 |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Senator Delph added as third author. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Senator Mrvan added as coauthor. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Senator Taylor added as coauthor. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Senator Head added as second author. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Committee report: amended do pass |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Reassigned to Tax and Fiscal Policy, pursuant to rule 68(b) |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Committee report: amended do pass, reassigned to Appropriations |
2014-01-14 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Commerce, Economic Development & Technology |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senator Holdman. |