IN SB0368 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-26 - First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety
Pending: House Veterans Affairs and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-26 - First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety
Pending: House Veterans Affairs and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the department of toxicology (department) to continue to collect fees in the amount that was being charged as of January 1, 2013. Requires the department to publish the January 1, 2013, fee schedule. Allows the department to adopt a rule to change the amount of a fee. Requires the department to notify each agency that has paid a fee to the department in the previous 12 months, and any other person that makes a request to be on the notification list, of the proposed new fee amount. Requires the notice to change the amount of the fee to be published. Legalizes and validates the fees that have been charged by the department since July 1, 2011. Establishes the breath test training and certification fund for deposit of the fees. Provides that the fund may be used by the department to pay for operating the department, replacing equipment, and conducting research.
Title
Department of toxicology fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-26 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Cosponsor: Rep. GiaQuinta |
2013-01-29 | Senate | House sponsor: Rep. Leonard |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 44: yeas 48 and nays 0 |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Senator Arnold added as second author |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-01-08 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Authored by Senator Wyss |