IN SB0367 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-28 - First reading: referred to Committee on Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Revocation of teaching licenses. Prohibits a school from hiring persons who have been convicted of certain crimes. Adds human trafficking to the list of offenses requiring license revocation. Permits the department of education to reinstate the license of a person convicted of certain crimes if the conviction is vacated on appeal. Requires the division of state court administration to weekly transmit a list of persons convicted of specified crimes to the department of education, and requires the department of education to: (1) compare this list with the department's list of licensed employees; and (2) institute revocation proceedings if it appears

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revocation of teaching licenses. Prohibits a school from hiring persons who have been convicted of certain crimes. Adds human trafficking to the list of offenses requiring license revocation. Permits the department of education to reinstate the license of a person convicted of certain crimes if the conviction is vacated on appeal. Requires the division of state court administration to weekly transmit a list of persons convicted of specified crimes to the department of education, and requires the department of education to: (1) compare this list with the department's list of licensed employees; and (2) institute revocation proceedings if it appears

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-28HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2017-02-24SenateReferred to the House
2017-02-23SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Cook
2017-02-23SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 180: yeas 48, nays 1
2017-02-21SenateAmendment #2 (Bassler) prevailed; voice vote
2017-02-21SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2017-02-13SenateSenator Delph added as third author
2017-02-09SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-01-30SenateSenator Kruse added as second author
2017-01-10SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2017-01-10SenateAuthored by Senator Bassler

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback