IN SB0365 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-21 - Public Law 143
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-21 - Public Law 143
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Town of Griffith. Changes the definition of "eligible municipality". Provides that if at least 2/3 of the voters voting in a special election held in the town of Griffith (town) on the public question of whether the territory of the town should be transferred to an adjacent township vote "yes" on the public question: (1) the legislative body of the eligible municipality may submit a petition to one or more adjacent townships within two years after the special election requesting that the adjacent township accept transfer of the territory of the town; (2) the legislative body of an adjacent township that receives a petition for the transfer of the town's territory may adopt a resolution accepting the transfer before the later of December 31 of the year in which the petition is received or the ninetieth day after the date that the petition is received; and (3) if no legislative body of an adjacent township to which a petition for transfer was submitted by the town accepts the transfer before July 1, 2020, the territory of the town is automatically transferred to the adjacent township with the greatest assessed value effective January 1, 2022.
Title
Town of Griffith.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 64 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 64 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-21 | Senate | Public Law 143 |
2020-03-21 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 341: yeas 32, nays 8 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2020-03-04 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2020-03-03 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 293: yeas 63, nays 31 |
2020-03-02 | House | Amendment #3 (Porter) failed; voice vote |
2020-03-02 | House | Amendment #1 (Porter) failed; voice vote |
2020-03-02 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-02-27 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-02-11 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Aylesworth |
2020-02-04 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Soliday |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 174: yeas 40, nays 9 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senator Buck added as second author |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Authored by Senator Niemeyer |