IN SB0363 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study committee. Urges the legislative council to assign the issue of liability and insurance coverage for nongovernmental entities that serve at-risk youth to an appropriate interim study committee.
Title
Interim study committee.
Sponsors
Sen. Stacey Donato [R] | Sen. Erin Houchin [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Rep. Ryan Lauer [R] |
Rep. Dale DeVon [R] | Rep. Karen Engleman [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives DeVon and Engleman |
2020-02-04 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Lauer |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 172: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Authored by Senators Donato and Houchin |