IN SB0361 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Public Law 55
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Eyelash extension specialists. Requires the state department of health to adopt reasonable rules to ensure the sanitary operation of facilities where eyelash extensions are applied. Specifies that the rules must establish training and certification requirements for individuals applying eyelash extensions for members of the public. Exempts the application of eyelash extensions from the law regulating cosmetology.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eyelash extension specialists.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-30 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 68 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-15SenatePublic Law 55
2021-04-15SenateSigned by the Governor
2021-04-14SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-04-08HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-04-05SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-03-31HouseReturned to the Senate without amendments
2021-03-30HouseRepresentative Wesco added as cosponsor
2021-03-30HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 335: yeas 68, nays 24
2021-03-29HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-03-25HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-03-04HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
2021-02-09SenateReferred to the House
2021-02-08SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Mayfield
2021-02-08SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 72: yeas 47, nays 0
2021-02-01SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-01-28SenateSenator Young M added as second author
2021-01-28SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-11SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor
2021-01-11SenateAuthored by Senator Brown L

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/senate/361/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/7/8/e/678e4577/SB0361.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/6/a/8/e6a8e812/SB0361.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/7/8/6/b786fe02/SB0361.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/7/d/0/b7d02119/SB0361.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/3/c/1/73c1caeb/SB0361.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/c/e/9/cce9a861/SB0361.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/a/2/a/5a2a2272/SB0361.04.ENRH.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/4/5/4/3454a9e3/SB0361.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/9/1/1/a9113549/SB0361.01.INTR.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/e/9/4/9e9423b1/SB0361.02.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/8/e/e/28ee5de0/SB0361.02.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/2/1/e/221ee12a/SB0361.02.COMS.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/7/d/6/37d6e2b3/SB0361.02.COMS.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/7/2/e/772ef21c/SB0361.03.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/e/3/a/2e3adad7/SB0361.03.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/d/4/1/8d4125a0/SB0361.03.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/5/4/d/c54df84f/SB0361.04.ENRH.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/4/6/4/74642e2b/SB0361.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/b/8/d/db8d1e61/SB0361.72_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/2/3/a/623a01db/SB0361.02.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/6/5/3/f653ef7a/SB0361.335_H.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback