IN SB0356 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-12 - First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities, Energy and Telecommunications
Pending: House Utilities, Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-12 - First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities, Energy and Telecommunications
Pending: House Utilities, Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Broadband grants for unserved areas. Authorizes the office of community and rural affairs (office) to award grants to qualified broadband providers in connection with qualified broadband projects involving the deployment of infrastructure to provide qualified broadband service in unserved areas in Indiana. Defines "qualified broadband service" as a connection to the Internet at an average speed of at least ten 10 megabits per second downstream and at least one megabit per second upstream, regardless of the technology used. Defines an "unserved area" as a geographic area in Indiana in which there is not at least one provider of terrestrial broadband
Title
Broadband grants for unserved areas. Authorizes the office of community and rural affairs (office) to award grants to qualified broadband providers in connection with qualified broadband projects involving the deployment of infrastructure to provide qualified broadband service in unserved areas in Indiana. Defines "qualified broadband service" as a connection to the Internet at an average speed of at least ten 10 megabits per second downstream and at least one megabit per second upstream, regardless of the technology used. Defines an "unserved area" as a geographic area in Indiana in which there is not at least one provider of terrestrial broadband
Sponsors
Sen. Erin Houchin [R] | Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Sen. Michael Delph [R] | Sen. Jean Leising [R] |
Sen. Mark Messmer [R] | Sen. James Tomes [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] |
Sen. Greg Taylor [D] | Sen. Susan Glick [R] | Sen. Travis Holdman [R] | Rep. Sharon Negele [R] |
Rep. David Ober [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities, Energy and Telecommunications |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Senators Glick and Holdman added as coauthors |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Senators Kruse and Taylor G added as coauthors |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Ober |
2018-02-06 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Negele |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 182: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 35 (c); technical correction committee report adopted |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Senators Delph, Leising, Messmer, Tomes added as coauthors |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-01-04 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities |
2018-01-04 | Senate | Authored by Senators Houchin and Koch |