IN SB0353 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 14 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Senator Kruse added as coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Absentee ballot applications. Provides that before an individual can access an application that is submitted in an electronic format using a module of the computerized list, the individual must provide either the individual's Indiana driver's license number or the last four digits of the individual's Social Security number.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Absentee ballot applications.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-13 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 71 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House - Minority report (Pierce) not substituted for majority report (Y: 22 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2021-04-08 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-15SenateSenator Kruse added as coauthor
2021-04-15SenateSenate advisors appointed: Koch and Yoder
2021-04-15SenateSenate conferees appointed: Houchin and Ford J.D.
2021-04-14HouseHouse advisors appointed: Morrison, Payne, Errington, Pierce and Pryor
2021-04-14HouseHouse conferees appointed: Wesco and Pfaff
2021-04-14SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2021-04-14SenateMotion to dissent filed
2021-04-14HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2021-04-13HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 433: yeas 71, nays 23
2021-04-12HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-04-08HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-04-08HouseMinority report (Pierce) not substituted for majority report Roll Call 371: yeas 22, nays 62
2021-03-04HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Elections and Apportionment
2021-02-23SenateReferred to the House
2021-02-22SenateSenator Raatz added as coauthor
2021-02-22SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Wesco
2021-02-22SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 146: yeas 34, nays 15
2021-02-22SenateSenator Ford Jon added as third author
2021-02-18SenateAmendment #1 (Ford J.D.) failed; voice vote
2021-02-18SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-02-15SenateCommittee report: Pursuant to Senate Rule 66(b); approved by Rules Committee as amended by Senate Committee on Elections.
2021-02-15SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure
2021-02-15SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-02-11SenateSenator Koch added as second author
2021-01-11SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Elections
2021-01-11SenateAuthored by Senator Houchin

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/senate/353/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/0/8/c/a08c7379/SB0353.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/6/c/9/36c9ca14/SB0353.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/6/a/e/a6aecfe7/SB0353.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/c/2/1/ec21f819/SB0353.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/f/0/f/4f0f09b5/SB0353.03.COMH.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/a/9/a/9a9ab617/SB0353.02.COMS.AMS001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/9/3/0/7930551c/SB0353.03.COMH.AMH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/a/b/f/4abf5dee/SB0353.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/7/2/7/f7270383/SB0353.02.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/9/4/4/a94464a5/SB0353.01.INTR.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/1/c/a/e1cab431/SB0353.02.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/f/3/3/ef33bc0e/SB0353.02.COMS.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/9/5/5/e955aca1/SB0353.02.COMS.CRH002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/b/1/7/db17bd6d/SB0353.02.COMS.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/6/f/9/36f949fe/SB0353.03.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/f/f/8/fff8db17/SB0353.03.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/b/6/6/7b660b5e/SB0353.03.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/a/2/4/4a24d533/SB0353.03.COMH.DIS01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/7/9/0/b790bcd0/SB0353.01.INTR.03.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/c/c/0/8cc05ac4/SB0353.146_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/d/2/b/2d2b991c/SB0353.02.COMS.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/7/e/3/37e3eb43/SB0353.371_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/d/c/5/9dc5c2e1/SB0353.433_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback