IN SB0348 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Next level connections fund. Provides that the appropriation in HEA 1001-2021 for the 2022-2023 state fiscal year to the Indiana department of transportation for the next level connections fund (IC 8-14-14.3) may be used only for projects located on U.S. Highway 30 and U.S. Highway 31 and for other road and bridge infrastructure projects.
Title
Next level connections fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Mishler [R] | Sen. Blake Doriot [R] | Sen. David Niezgodski [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Brown [R] |
Sen. Travis Holdman [R] | Sen. Linda Rogers [R] | Rep. Dave Heine [R] | Rep. Craig Snow [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-08 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Snow C |
2022-02-01 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Heine |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 177: yeas 48, nays 1 |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as coauthor |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senator Holdman added as coauthor |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senator Brown L added as coauthor |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senator Niezgodski added as third author |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Senator Doriot added as second author |
2022-01-11 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Authored by Senator Mishler |