IN SB0347 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Public Law 64
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Public Law 64
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Tribal law enforcement. Authorizes police officers appointed by a tribe to exercise police powers in Indiana if the tribal police officer meets the standards of the Indiana law enforcement academy. Provides that a tribe may authorize a tribal police officer to exercise police powers in the entire state, or in any part of the state, if certain conditions are met. Requires a tribe seeking to employ an individual as a tribal police officer who will exercise police powers in Indiana to request the individual's employment history, if the individual was previously employed by a law enforcement agency. Makes conforming amendments.
Title
Tribal law enforcement.
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Mishler [R] | Sen. David Niezgodski [D] | Sen. Linda Rogers [R] | Rep. Jake Teshka [R] |
Rep. Gregory Steuerwald [R] | Rep. Maureen Bauer [D] | Rep. Edward DeLaney [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 41 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | Public Law 64 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 324: yeas 41, nays 5 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2022-02-22 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2022-02-21 | House | Representatives Bauer M and DeLaney added as cosponsors |
2022-02-21 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 212: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2022-02-17 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-02-15 | House | Representative Steuerwald added as cosponsor |
2022-02-15 | House | Representative Teshka J added as sponsor |
2022-02-15 | House | Representative Teshka J removed as cosponsor |
2022-02-15 | House | Representative Steuerwald removed as sponsor |
2022-02-15 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-02-08 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Teshka J |
2022-02-01 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Steuerwald |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 176: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as coauthor |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Mishler) prevailed; voice vote |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-01-11 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Authored by Senators Mishler and Niezgodski |