IN SB0347 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Public Law 102
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Public Law 102
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Water resources. Repeals the law requiring all water utilities to annually report to the utility regulatory commission on the utilities' operations and maintenance costs in providing water service to their customers. Requires the Indiana finance authority (authority), before November 1, 2017, to prepare and submit in an electronic format to the executive director of the legislative services agency a report on non-revenue water (the difference between the volume of water entering a water distribution system and the volume of water consumption billed to customers served by the water distribution system) and water loss in Indiana. Requires the authority to perform
Title
Water resources. Repeals the law requiring all water utilities to annually report to the utility regulatory commission on the utilities' operations and maintenance costs in providing water service to their customers. Requires the Indiana finance authority (authority), before November 1, 2017, to prepare and submit in an electronic format to the executive director of the legislative services agency a report on non-revenue water (the difference between the volume of water entering a water distribution system and the volume of water consumption billed to customers served by the water distribution system) and water loss in Indiana. Requires the authority to perform
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-29 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | Senate | Public Law 102 |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-03-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2016-02-29 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2016-02-29 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 255: yeas 97, nays 0 |
2016-02-25 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-02-18 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2016-02-09 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities, Energy and Telecommunications |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Senator Delph added as coauthor |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Beumer, Stemler, Hale |
2016-02-01 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Wolkins |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 113: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Senator Stoops added as third author |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Senator Eckerty added as second author |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-01-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Charbonneau |