IN SB0346 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-21 - Public Law 114
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-21 - Public Law 114
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Donation of certain local funds to a foundation. Provides that when a county, municipality, or township (unit) donates the proceeds of the sale of a utility or a facility, or the amount of a gift, to a foundation, the unit and the foundation may agree that distribution of the proceeds is governed by the Uniform Prudent Management of Institutional Funds Act (IC 30-2-12). Provides that this authority applies only to the donation of proceeds that occurs after December 31, 2015. Provides that department of local government finance may not reduce a unit's property tax levy because of: (1) the donation
Title
Donation of certain local funds to a foundation. Provides that when a county, municipality, or township (unit) donates the proceeds of the sale of a utility or a facility, or the amount of a gift, to a foundation, the unit and the foundation may agree that distribution of the proceeds is governed by the Uniform Prudent Management of Institutional Funds Act (IC 30-2-12). Provides that this authority applies only to the donation of proceeds that occurs after December 31, 2015. Provides that department of local government finance may not reduce a unit's property tax levy because of: (1) the donation
Sponsors
Sen. Ronald Grooms [R] | Sen. Jon Ford [R] | Sen. Vaneta Becker [R] | Sen. David Niezgodski [D] |
Sen. Erin Houchin [R] | Rep. Edward Clere [R] | Rep. Steven Stemler [D] | Rep. Karen Engleman [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House Amendments (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-21 | Senate | Public Law 114 |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Amendments; Roll Call 437: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2017-03-28 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2017-03-27 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 308: yeas 98, nays 0 |
2017-03-23 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-03-21 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-03-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Senator Houchin added as coauthor |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Senator Ford added as second author |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Senator Ford removed as coauthor |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Stemler and Engleman |
2017-01-30 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Clere |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 41: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Senator Niezgodski added as coauthor |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Grooms) prevailed; voice vote |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-01-09 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Coauthored by Senators Ford and Becker |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Authored by Senator Grooms |