IN SB0346 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-21 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-21 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Redevelopment commissions.
Title
Redevelopment commissions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2013-03-21 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2013-03-12 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce, Small Business and Economic Development |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as coauthor |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Cosponsor: Rep. Wolkins |
2013-02-11 | Senate | House sponsor: Rep. Friend |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 93: yeas 48 and nays 0 |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Senator Skinner added as coauthor |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-01-08 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Authored by Senator Head |