IN SB0344 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-24 - Public Law 36
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-24 - Public Law 36
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the division of school building physical security and safety (division) within the department of education. Provides that the division carries out certain responsibilities related to the school safety specialist training and certification program, establishing emergency protocols, and establishing guidelines for using professional services to integrate physical security improvements and safety practices in the construction, renovation, repair, or alteration of school facilities.
Title
School building safety.
Sponsors
Sen. Lindel Hume [D] | Sen. Pete Miller [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Rep. Kreg Battles [D] |
Rep. Rochelle VanDenburgh [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Concur in House Amendments (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Floor - (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House Floor - (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House Committee on Education - Roll Call 034402 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate Committee on Education and Career Development - Roll Call 034401 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Floor - (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House Floor - (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House Committee on Education - Roll Call 034402 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate Committee on Education and Career Development - Roll Call 034401 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-24 | Senate | Public Law 36 |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Motion to Concur in House Amendments: prevailed; Roll Call 362: yeas 48 and nays 1 |
2014-03-03 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2014-03-03 | House | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 353: yeas 96 and nays 0 |
2014-02-26 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed. |
2014-02-26 | House | SB 344 Amendment #1 (Battles), prevailed. |
2014-02-24 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-20 | House | Representative VanDenburgh added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-10 | House | First Reading: Referred to Education |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Representative Battles added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Representative Behning added as sponsor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 185: yeas 45 and nays 3 |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as coauthor. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Education and Career Development |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senator Hume, Miller Pete |