IN SB0343 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the law enforcement training board to adopt rules for minimum standards for a course of study on cultural sensitivity training, including training on the U nonimmigrant visa. Provides that a county law enforcement continuing education program: (1) shall provide to each law enforcement officer employed by the county; and (2) may provide to each law enforcement officer employed by a city or town law enforcement agency within the county; continuing education concerning the U nonimmigrant visa and continuing education concerning cultural diversity awareness that includes an understanding of certain cultural issues. Requires the Indiana Emergency Medical Services Commission to establish protocols for persons who provide emergency medical services to notify law enforcement when services have been provided to an individual who has attempted to commit suicide and who has indicated that the attempt was due in part to bullying.
Title
Law enforcement training and emergency services.
Sponsors
Sen. Timothy Lanane [D] | Sen. Thomas Wyss [R] | Sen. Jean Breaux [D] | Sen. James Merritt [R] |
Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Rep. Linda Lawson [D] | Rep. Sheila Klinker [D] | Rep. Holli Sullivan [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Concur in House Amendments (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Floor - (Y: 68 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House Floor - (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety - Roll Call 034302 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Homeland Security, Transportation, and Veterans Affairs - Roll Call 034301 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Floor - (Y: 68 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House Floor - (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety - Roll Call 034302 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Homeland Security, Transportation, and Veterans Affairs - Roll Call 034301 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Public Law 164 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-03-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2014-03-12 | House | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the House |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the Senate |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Motion to Concur in House Amendments: prevailed; Roll Call 361: yeas 40 and nays 9 |
2014-03-03 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2014-03-03 | House | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 354: yeas 68 and nays 27 |
2014-02-27 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed. |
2014-02-27 | House | SB 343 Amendment #1 (Goodin), prevailed. |
2014-02-25 | House | Representative Sullivan added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-25 | House | Representative Klinker added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-25 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-10 | House | First Reading: Referred to Veterans Affairs and Public Safety |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Representative Lawson added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Representative Cox added as sponsor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 184: yeas 42 and nays 6 |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Senator Merritt added as coauthor. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Senator Breaux added as coauthor. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Senator Wyss added as second author. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Homeland Security, Transportation, and Veterans Affairs |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senator Lanane. |