IN SB0335 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Enrolled on February 24 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-04 - Representative Moseley added as advisor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 24 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-04 - Representative Moseley added as advisor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the executive director of the department of homeland security to develop and implement protocols concerning the use of severe weather warning sirens. Allows a volunteer firefighter serving as the executive, a member of the executive body, or a member of the legislative body or fiscal body of a county, city, town, or township (unit) on January 1, 2014, to serve one consecutive term in the same elected office of the unit and also serve as a volunteer firefighter for the unit.
Title
Emergency notification systems.
Sponsors
Sen. Brent Waltz [R] | Sen. Thomas Wyss [R] | Rep. Karlee Macer [D] | Rep. Lloyd Arnold [R] |
Sen. Eric Koch [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-24 - House - House Floor - (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety - Roll Call 033503 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations - Roll Call 033502 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Local Government - Roll Call 033501 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety - Roll Call 033503 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations - Roll Call 033502 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Local Government - Roll Call 033501 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-04 | House | Representative Moseley added as advisor |
2014-03-04 | House | Representative Mahan added as advisor |
2014-03-04 | House | Representative Torr added as advisor |
2014-03-04 | House | Representative Macer added as conferee |
2014-03-04 | House | Representative Frye added as conferee |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senator M. Young added as advisor |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senator R. Young added as advisor |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senator Wyss added as advisor |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senator Stoops added as conferee |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senator Waltz added as conferee |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2014-02-24 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2014-02-24 | House | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 264: yeas 95 and nays 3 |
2014-02-20 | House | Second reading: engrossed. |
2014-02-20 | House | Representative Koch added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-18 | House | Representative Arnold added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-18 | House | Representative Macer added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-18 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-10 | House | First Reading: Referred to Veterans Affairs and Public Safety |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Representative Frye added as sponsor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 183: yeas 48 and nays 0 |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Senator Wyss added as second author. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, reassigned to Appropriations |
2014-01-14 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Local Government |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senator Waltz. |