IN SB0333 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-09 - First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
Pending: Senate Tax and Fiscal Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-09 - First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
Pending: Senate Tax and Fiscal Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Phases the corporate income tax rate down from 8.5% to 2% by June 30, 2013. Provides that the following state tax credits may not be awarded after December 30, 2012: (1) Research expense credit. (2) Prison investment credit. (3) Enterprise zone loan interest credit. (4) Neighborhood assistance credit. (5) Enterprise zone investment cost credit. (6) Industrial recovery tax credit. (7) Military base recovery credit. (8) Military base investment cost credit. (9) Economic development for a growing economy credit. (10) Capital investment credit. (11) Indiana riverboat building credit. (12) Individual development account credit. (13) Community revitalization enhancement district credit. (14) Venture capital investment credit. (15) Coal combustion product credit. (16) Hoosier business investment credit. (17) Blended biodiesel credit. (18) Ethanol production credit. (19) Coal gasification technology investment credit. (20) Headquarters relocation credit. (21) New employer tax credit. Provides that the computer equipment donations credit, historic rehabilitation credit, and school scholarship credit may not be awarded after December 31, 2012, to a taxpayer other than an individual.
Title
State taxes.
Sponsors
Rep. Milo Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-09 | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy | |
2012-01-09 | Authored by Senator Smith |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.in.gov/apps/lsa/session/billwatch/billinfo?year=2012&session=1&request=getBill&doctype=SB&docno=0333 |
Text | http://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2012/IN/IN0333.1.html |