IN SB0332 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Public Law 43
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Public Law 43
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Planning and zoning affecting military bases. Allows a unit to establish a military impact zoning district for an area adversely impacted by the effects of military operations. Establishes a state area of interest that is comprised of land within one or both of the following: (1) Within three miles of certain military installations. (2) Within a military impact zoning district. Makes planning, zoning, and development activity (activity) in a state area of interest subject to the military installation commander's determination regarding the activity's impact on military operations. Allows a representative of the military installation to serve as a nonvoting adviser to the unit's plan commission. Requires a lease or real estate sales disclosure form to disclose that the property is within a state area of interest. Provides that the responsibility for the disclosure required by the owner that the property is located near a military installation rests solely with the owner of the property and no liability for the owner's failure to make the required disclosure shall accrue to any third party.
Title
Planning and zoning affecting military bases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-20 | Senate | Public Law 43 |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-04-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 323: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2023-03-24 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2023-03-23 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 295: yeas 90, nays 0 |
2023-03-16 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-03-14 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-02-28 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Senator Koch added as coauthor |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as coauthor |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives May, Lindauer, Karickhoff |
2023-02-06 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Manning |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 69: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Senator Walker G added as coauthor |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Donato) prevailed; voice vote |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Senators Dernulc and Tomes added as coauthors |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Senator Donato added as third author |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Senator Buck added as second author |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Senator Yoder added as coauthor |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Senator Garten added as coauthor |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2023-01-12 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Authored by Senator Messmer |