IN SB0331 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Public Law 79
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Public Law 79
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
National guard license plates. Extends eligibility for National Guard license plates to former members of the National Guard.
Title
National guard license plates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | Public Law 79 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2020-03-04 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2020-03-03 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 282: yeas 86, nays 0 |
2020-03-02 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-02-27 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-02-17 | House | Representatives Sullivan and Macer added as cosponsors |
2020-02-11 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senators Bohacek, Crane, Freeman, Spartz, Donato added as coauthors |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Bartels |
2020-02-03 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Judy |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 127: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senators Tomes, Crider, Boots added as coauthors |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senator Garten added as second author |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Senator Ford J.D. added as coauthor |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Authored by Senator Zay |