IN SB0325 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-03 - Senator Melton added as coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-03 - Senator Melton added as coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Public trust ownership of Lake Michigan. Declares that, absent any authorized legislative conveyance before February 14, 2018, the state of Indiana owns all of Lake Michigan within the boundaries of Indiana in trust for the use and enjoyment of all citizens of Indiana. Provides that an owner of land that borders Lake Michigan does not have the exclusive right to use the water or land below the ordinary high water mark of Lake Michigan. Declares that the citizens of Indiana have a vested right to: (1) enjoy the natural scenic beauty of Lake Michigan; (2) enjoy and use the natural resources of Lake Michigan; and (3) use Lake Michigan for recreational purposes. Authorizes the department of natural resources to adopt rules to identify the location of the ordinary high water mark on the land adjoining the waters of Lake Michigan for purposes of administering the navigable waterways law.
Title
Public trust ownership of Lake Michigan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senator Melton added as coauthor |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senator Crider added as second author |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Senator Tallian added as coauthor |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Authored by Senator Glick |