IN SB0323 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Public Law 185
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Legislative studies. Requires the legislative services agency to: (1) study the combined reporting approach to apportioning income and transfer pricing for income tax purposes; and (2) report the results of the study before October 1, 2016, to the legislative council and to the interim study committee on fiscal policy. Requires the interim study committee on fiscal policy to hold at least one public hearing at which the legislative services agency presents the results of the study. Urges the legislative council to assign an interim study committee certain study topics related to gaming and . Urges the legislative council to assign

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Legislative studies. Requires the legislative services agency to: (1) study the combined reporting approach to apportioning income and transfer pricing for income tax purposes; and (2) report the results of the study before October 1, 2016, to the legislative council and to the interim study committee on fiscal policy. Requires the interim study committee on fiscal policy to hold at least one public hearing at which the legislative services agency presents the results of the study. Urges the legislative council to assign an interim study committee certain study topics related to gaming and . Urges the legislative council to assign

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House Amendments (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-24SenatePublic Law 185
2016-03-24SenateSigned by the Governor
2016-03-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2016-03-09HouseSigned by the Speaker
2016-03-09SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2016-03-04SenateSenate concurred in House Amendments; Roll Call 337: yeas 44, nays 0
2016-03-02SenateMotion to concur filed
2016-03-01HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2016-03-01HouseRepresentatives Klinker and Brown, T. added as cosponsors
2016-03-01HouseRepresentative Porter added as cosponsor
2016-03-01HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 308: yeas 92, nays 0
2016-02-29HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2016-02-25HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2016-02-09HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2016-02-03SenateReferred to the House
2016-02-03SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Huston
2016-02-03SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 160: yeas 49, nays 0
2016-02-02SenateSenator Broden added as coauthor
2016-02-02SenateSenator Miller, Pete added as second author
2016-02-01SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2016-01-28SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2016-01-07SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy
2016-01-07SenateAuthored by Senator Hershman

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2016/bills/senate/323/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/a/6/2/fa62a759/SB0323.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/6/3/3/96332bd1/SB0323.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/7/0/3/3703df1f/SB0323.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/7/1/e/971ecd4b/SB0323.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/1/d/9/51d9442d/SB0323.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/9/3/7/f937a53d/SB0323.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/0/4/2/70429980/SB0323.04.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/0/9/b/e09b7338/SB0323.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/3/2/b/d32b0155/SB0323.160.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/6/7/5/e675a71e/SB0323.02.COMS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/6/d/f/46dfdd2d/SB0323.308.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/9/5/6/a9562f24/SB0323.337.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback