IN SB0319 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Sentencing after probation revocation. Permits a person convicted of a Level 6 felony to be committed to the department of correction (DOC) if: (1) the person's probation, parole, or community corrections is revoked due to commission of a new criminal offense; (2) the person has been charged with the new criminal offense; and (3) commitment to the DOC is due to the revocation.
Title
Sentencing after probation revocation. Permits a person convicted of a Level 6 felony to be committed to the department of correction (DOC) if: (1) the person's probation, parole, or community corrections is revoked due to commission of a new criminal offense; (2) the person has been charged with the new criminal offense; and (3) commitment to the DOC is due to the revocation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-04 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2019-02-21 | House | Representative May added as cosponsor |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Senator Houchin added as coauthor |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Senator Bohacek added as coauthor |
2019-02-04 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Steuerwald |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 65: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Senator Zay added as coauthor |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Senator Young M added as coauthor |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Senators Sandlin, Busch, Randolph added as coauthors |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Senator Koch added as second author |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-01-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Head |