IN SB0316 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Enrolled on March 31 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Signed by the Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Military and veterans matters. Changes the definition of a "qualified service member" for purposes of eligibility under the military family relief fund (fund). Requires the Indiana veterans' affairs commission (commission) to: (1) develop, adopt, and issue a policy listing the disallowable separation codes of each branch of the armed forces; and (2) review the policy for amendment and adopt any necessary amendments before July 1 of each year. Provides that the department of veterans' affairs (department) may use not more than 10% of the average annual license plate revenue to cover direct costs associated with the marketing and promotion of the military relief fund. Specifies that the department may not use any of the amount for administrative costs, including payroll or any other overhead expenses. Provides that the department may deny an incomplete application for a grant under the fund if all required documentation is not received within 30 days after the date the applicant filed the application. Provides that, if an applicant appeals a denial of tuition and fee exemption benefits (benefits) not later than 15 days before the start of the semester for which the benefits would apply, the commission shall make a reasonable effort to issue a final order before the start of the semester.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Military and veterans matters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-30 - House - House Floor - (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #1 (Ford J.D.) failed (Y: 9 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-07HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-04-05SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-03-31HouseReturned to the Senate without amendments
2021-03-30HouseRepresentatives Lindauer, Hamilton, Harris added as cosponsors
2021-03-30HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 333: yeas 90, nays 3
2021-03-29HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-03-25HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-03-16HouseReferred to the Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
2021-03-16HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-03-02HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety
2021-02-17SenateReferred to the House
2021-02-16SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Bartels
2021-02-16SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 133: yeas 46, nays 0
2021-02-15SenateAmendment #2 (Ford J.D.) failed; voice vote
2021-02-15SenateAmendment #1 (Ford J.D.) failed; Roll Call 104: yeas 9, nays 35
2021-02-15SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-02-11SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-02-02SenateCommittee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
2021-01-25SenateSenator Houchin added as coauthor
2021-01-12SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and The Military
2021-01-12SenateCoauthored by Senator Baldwin
2021-01-12SenateAuthored by Senators Garten, Tomes, Boots

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/senate/316/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/e/b/5/9eb5288a/SB0316.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/d/d/a/3dda11f0/SB0316.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/1/f/7/f1f7d7a7/SB0316.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/9/f/5/b9f5bba8/SB0316.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/c/d/f/ecdf2e84/SB0316.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/5/2/3/752328c9/SB0316.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/7/c/e/27ce8eb4/SB0316.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/e/6/1/ce61d133/SB0316.05.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/b/7/8/3b78f8f6/SB0316.05.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/f/8/2/6f823c8d/SB0316.06.ENRH.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/0/c/4/70c4e995/SB0316.03.COMS.AMS001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/8/4/7/78470099/SB0316.03.COMS.AMS002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/c/c/f/9ccffa13/SB0316.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/6/9/7/369736e5/SB0316.02.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/2/1/c/521caf11/SB0316.01.INTR.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/8/b/c/18bcabe5/SB0316.02.COMS.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/b/2/6/5b26a5a2/SB0316.03.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/a/9/3/2a93a81d/SB0316.03.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/d/d/2/7dd26538/SB0316.03.COMS.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/2/4/c/c24c85b4/SB0316.04.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/1/e/c/d1ec58d8/SB0316.03.COMS.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/7/2/2/7722c1dc/SB0316.04.COMH.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/0/c/d/e0cdaff7/SB0316.05.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/2/3/3/02335d08/SB0316.05.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/f/5/b/2f5bf964/SB0316.05.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/5/f/0/05f05b71/SB0316.06.ENRH.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/c/3/c/dc3c393e/SB0316.01.INTR.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/d/5/d/8d5d72b3/SB0316.02.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/c/9/3/3c93ed6d/SB0316.104_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/5/7/a/157a7ef5/SB0316.133_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/f/8/e/cf8e6322/SB0316.03.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/5/e/c/d5ec789b/SB0316.04.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/e/2/0/ee20189b/SB0316.333_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback