IN SB0310 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-12 - Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to committee on Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-12 - Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to committee on Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Alternative schools. Makes changes to the requirements as to what information must be reported on a school corporation's annual performance report. Provides that when a student is expelled from school, the department of education shall deposit the remaining state tuition support for the expelled student into the alternative education fund to be used to provide grants to alternative education programs. Establishes the alternative education fund. Provides that if a student who was enrolled in a public school on the date of the fall count of ADM is not enrolled in the school on the spring count of ADM because the
Title
Alternative schools. Makes changes to the requirements as to what information must be reported on a school corporation's annual performance report. Provides that when a student is expelled from school, the department of education shall deposit the remaining state tuition support for the expelled student into the alternative education fund to be used to provide grants to alternative education programs. Establishes the alternative education fund. Provides that if a student who was enrolled in a public school on the date of the fall count of ADM is not enrolled in the school on the spring count of ADM because the
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Education & Career Development - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-12 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to committee on Appropriations |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Senator Bassler added as second author |
2015-01-08 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Education & Career Development |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Authored by Senator Merritt |