IN SB0304 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Intimidation. Provides that a person who communicates a threat: (1) with the intent of causing a person to engage in conduct against the person's will; (2) as retaliation for a prior lawful act; or (3) and places another person in the fear that certain threats will be carried out; commits intimidation, a Class A misdemeanor. Provides that the offense is a Level 6 felony if the threat is based on the person's occupation or relates to an act taken within the scope of the person's occupation, and increases the penalty to a Level 5 felony if the threat is to commit terrorism or is made in furtherance of an act of terrorism.
Title
Intimidation. Provides that a person who communicates a threat: (1) with the intent of causing a person to engage in conduct against the person's will; (2) as retaliation for a prior lawful act; or (3) and places another person in the fear that certain threats will be carried out; commits intimidation, a Class A misdemeanor. Provides that the offense is a Level 6 felony if the threat is based on the person's occupation or relates to an act taken within the scope of the person's occupation, and increases the penalty to a Level 5 felony if the threat is to commit terrorism or is made in furtherance of an act of terrorism.
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Sen. Michael Crider [R] | Sen. Aaron Freeman [R] | Sen. Susan Glick [R] |
Sen. Jack Sandlin [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Rep. Wendy McNamara [R] | Rep. Ronald Bacon [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Bacon |
2019-02-19 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative McNamara |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 156: yeas 40, nays 0 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Senator Sandlin added as coauthor |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Senator Glick added as coauthor |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Senator Freeman added as third author |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Senator Crider added as second author |
2019-01-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Koch |