IN SB0304 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Public Law 100
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Public Law 100
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Property tax matters. For the January 1, 2017, assessment date, increases the assessed value limit for the property tax deduction for certain veterans with a disability from $143,160 to $175,000. Provides that an individual may claim a deduction from the assessed value of the individual's homestead if: (1) the individual served in the military or naval forces of the United States; (2) the individual received an honorable discharge; (3) the individual has a disability of at least 50%; (4) the individual's disability is evidenced by a pension certificate or an award of compensation issued by the United States Department of Veterans
Title
Property tax matters. For the January 1, 2017, assessment date, increases the assessed value limit for the property tax deduction for certain veterans with a disability from $143,160 to $175,000. Provides that an individual may claim a deduction from the assessed value of the individual's homestead if: (1) the individual served in the military or naval forces of the United States; (2) the individual received an honorable discharge; (3) the individual has a disability of at least 50%; (4) the individual's disability is evidenced by a pension certificate or an award of compensation issued by the United States Department of Veterans
Sponsors
Sen. Howard Kenley [R] | Sen. Travis Holdman [R] | Sen. Brandt Hershman [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Sen. Jean Breaux [D] | Sen. Susan Glick [R] | Rep. Timothy Brown [R] | Rep. John Bartlett [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House Amendments (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | Senate | Public Law 100 |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-03-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Amendments; Roll Call 334: yeas 44, nays 0 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2016-03-01 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2016-03-01 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 305: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2016-02-29 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-02-25 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-02-09 | House | Representative Brown, T. added as sponsor |
2016-02-09 | House | Representative Brown, T. removed as cosponsor |
2016-02-09 | House | Representative Baird removed as sponsor |
2016-02-09 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Senator Glick added as coauthor |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Brown, T. and Bartlett |
2016-02-02 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Baird |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 148: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Senator Breaux added as coauthor |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Senator Hershman added as third author |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Senator Holdman added as second author |
2016-01-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy |
2016-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Kenley |