IN SB0303 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 24 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Signed by the Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Motor vehicle fuel matters. Provides that an underground storage tank may not be installed for the purpose of storing regulated substances unless the underground storage tank system meets the requirements of 40 CFR 280.32. Establishes new maximum vapor pressure limits for gasoline and for gasohol (a blend of gasoline and ethanol). Provides that a fuel dispenser from which a retail customer dispenses gasohol containing more than 10% and not more than 15% ethanol must display the statement "Attention: E15. Check owner's manual for compatibility and warranty requirements." or a similar statement approved by the United States Environmental Protection Agency. Requires that this statement be displayed on a fuel dispenser next to the fuel grade selection button, as a part of or in addition to the label about the use of ethanol in certain vehicles and certain engines that is required under current federal regulations. Makes the failure of an owner or operator of a fuel dispenser to comply with the gasohol dispenser statement requirement a Class A infraction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicle fuel matters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 71 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-04-12SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-04-01SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 321: yeas 46, nays 2
2021-03-29SenateMotion to concur filed
2021-03-24HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2021-03-23HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 295: yeas 71, nays 23
2021-03-22HouseAmendment #4 (McNamara) prevailed; voice vote
2021-03-22HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2021-03-18HouseRepresentative Jackson added as cosponsor
2021-03-16HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-03-04HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs
2021-02-24SenateReferred to the House
2021-02-23SenateHouse sponsor: Representative McNamara
2021-02-23SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 187: yeas 46, nays 2
2021-02-22SenateSenator Randolph added as third author
2021-02-22SenateSenator Zay added as second author
2021-02-22SenateAmendment #1 (Messmer) prevailed; voice vote
2021-02-22SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2021-02-15SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-11SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs
2021-01-11SenateAuthored by Senator Messmer

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/senate/303/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/6/b/e/a6bec9fd/SB0303.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/3/4/b/534bbb94/SB0303.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/8/b/8/c8b8cc7f/SB0303.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/b/2/c/6b2cfeeb/SB0303.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/0/0/2/0002bd3d/SB0303.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/3/a/3/33a346eb/SB0303.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/f/5/4/8f5401d3/SB0303.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/6/c/7/76c7e607/SB0303.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/c/9/a/4c9a4741/SB0303.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/8/5/e/185e8776/SB0303.06.ENRH.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/2/8/d/528deeea/SB0303.02.COMS.AMS001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/2/7/9/c2790d12/SB0303.04.COMH.AMH001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/e/2/d/ae2d6422/SB0303.04.COMH.AMH002.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/1/2/a/312a8276/SB0303.04.COMH.AMH003.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/1/1/c/511c8ce9/SB0303.04.COMH.AMH004.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/9/f/b/c9fbff40/SB0303.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/9/d/4/79d4990c/SB0303.02.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/3/8/e/b38e8b9d/SB0303.01.INTR.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/1/d/4/11d4019f/SB0303.03.ENGS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/0/7/e/107e3e05/SB0303.03.ENGS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/2/5/6/62563a29/SB0303.03.ENGS.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/5/f/8/75f8ad3b/SB0303.04.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/1/8/7/81876770/SB0303.05.ENGH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/d/2/b/cd2ba332/SB0303.05.ENGH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/3/0/5/0305120c/SB0303.05.ENGH.CON01.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/b/4/8/ab48c096/SB0303.06.ENRH.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/1/9/2/519268e9/SB0303.01.INTR.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/c/c/e/9cce301f/SB0303.187_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/4/c/e/e4ce68f2/SB0303.03.ENGS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/d/7/6/dd7606e6/SB0303.295_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/0/d/c/90dc9190/SB0303.321_S.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback