IN SB0303 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-21 - Public Law 108
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-21 - Public Law 108
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Direct primary care agreements. Specifies that: (a) a direct primary care agreement is not insurance; and (b) a primary care provider or an employer of primary care provider that enters into a direct primary care agreement is not required to obtain an insurance certificate of authority. Sets forth requirements of a direct primary care agreement.
Title
Direct primary care agreements. Specifies that: (a) a direct primary care agreement is not insurance; and (b) a primary care provider or an employer of primary care provider that enters into a direct primary care agreement is not required to obtain an insurance certificate of authority. Sets forth requirements of a direct primary care agreement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House Amendments (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-21 | Senate | Public Law 108 |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Amendments; Roll Call 449: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2017-04-05 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2017-04-04 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 377: yeas 97, nays 0 |
2017-04-03 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-03-30 | House | Representative Carbaugh added as cosponsor |
2017-03-30 | House | Representatives Schaibley and Heaton added as cosponsors |
2017-03-30 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-02-28 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2017-02-14 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Kirchhofer |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 114: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senator Leising added as coauthor |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Senator Stoops added as coauthor |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as second author |
2017-01-09 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Authored by Senator Koch |