IN SB0300 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Public Law 60
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Public Law 60
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Solid waste management district board membership. Provides that if a county contains only one municipality, the board of the county's single county solid waste management district must include one member: (1) who is a freeholder; (2) whose freehold is located in a conservancy district that is located entirely within the county and contains the greatest number of freeholds of any conservancy district located in the county; and (3) who is appointed to the board of the county district by the board of the conservancy district.
Title
Solid waste management district board membership. Provides that if a county contains only one municipality, the board of the county's single county solid waste management district must include one member: (1) who is a freeholder; (2) whose freehold is located in a conservancy district that is located entirely within the county and contains the greatest number of freeholds of any conservancy district located in the county; and (3) who is appointed to the board of the county district by the board of the conservancy district.
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Sen. James Buck [R] | Sen. Jean Breaux [D] | Rep. Chris May [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | Senate | Public Law 60 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-03-29 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2017-03-28 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 337: yeas 88, nays 0 |
2017-03-27 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-03-23 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-02-28 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Senator Breaux added as coauthor |
2017-01-31 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative May |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 48: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Senator Buck added as second author |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-01-09 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Authored by Senator Koch |