IN SB0298 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Public Law 62
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Public Law 62
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Certificates of public advantage. Defines "merger" and "merger agreement" for purposes of the certificate of public advantage (certificate) for certain hospital mergers. Requires the state department of health (state department) to actively supervise a merger. Allows the state department to enter into an agreement with a nonprofit organization or a postsecondary educational institution to study the impacts of the certificate of public advantage on the community's health metrics and outcomes. Requires holders of a certificate to pay for reasonable charges incurred by the state department.
Title
Certificates of public advantage.
Sponsors
Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] | Sen. Jon Ford [R] | Rep. Alan Morrison [R] | Rep. Bradford Barrett [R] |
Rep. Rita Fleming [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | Public Law 62 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 323: yeas 46, nays 0 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2022-02-24 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2022-02-23 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 262: yeas 89, nays 1 |
2022-02-22 | House | Amendment #2 (Morrison) prevailed; voice vote |
2022-02-22 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2022-02-14 | House | Representative Fleming added as cosponsor |
2022-02-10 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-02-01 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Senator Ford Jon added as second author |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Barrett |
2022-01-20 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Morrison |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 36: yeas 46, nays 0 |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-01-10 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Authored by Senator Charbonneau |