IN SB0297 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-29 - Public Law 79
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-29 - Public Law 79
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Small brewer barrel limits. Changes the number of barrels of beer that a small brewer may manufacture in a calendar year for sale or distribution within Indiana from 30,000 to 90,000. Provides that the barrel limits apply to the aggregate number of barrels of beer that the small brewer manufactures at all the small brewer's breweries. Prohibits a small brewer from selling and delivering more than a total of 30,000 barrels of beer in a calendar year directly to a person holding an alcoholic beverage retailer or dealer permit. Makes conforming changes to brewery and brewer permit provisions. Makes a
Title
Small brewer barrel limits. Changes the number of barrels of beer that a small brewer may manufacture in a calendar year for sale or distribution within Indiana from 30,000 to 90,000. Provides that the barrel limits apply to the aggregate number of barrels of beer that the small brewer manufactures at all the small brewer's breweries. Prohibits a small brewer from selling and delivering more than a total of 30,000 barrels of beer in a calendar year directly to a person holding an alcoholic beverage retailer or dealer permit. Makes conforming changes to brewery and brewer permit provisions. Makes a
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-31 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 90 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - House Committee on Public Policy - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Public Policy - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - House Committee on Public Policy - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Public Policy - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-29 | Senate | Public Law 79 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-04-01 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2015-03-31 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 349: yeas 90, nays 5 |
2015-03-30 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-03-26 | House | Representative Huston added as cosponsor |
2015-03-26 | House | Representative GiaQuinta added as cosponsor |
2015-03-26 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-03-19 | House | Representative Clere added as cosponsor |
2015-03-05 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Representative Dermody added as sponsor |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 233: yeas 43, nays 7 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Alting) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Senators Ford and Lanane added as coauthors |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Senator Messmer added as third author |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Senator Merritt added as second author |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-08 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Authored by Senator Alting |