IN SB0292 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the state department of health (state department) to inspect an abortion clinic at least one time per year and to conduct complaint inspections as needed. Requires a pregnant woman to be informed orally and in writing at least 18 hours before the abortion of an emergency telephone number for the facility that is available and answered 24 hours a day, seven days a week. Requires a physician who is performing an abortion to have hospital admitting privileges in writing. Requires the abortion clinic to keep at the clinic a copy of the admitting privileges of certain physicians and to provide a copy of the admitting privileges to the state department. Requires the state department to: (1) verify the validity of the admitting privileges documents; (2) remove any identifying information from the admitting privileges document before releasing the document; and (3) confirm to a member of the public, upon request, that admitting privileges have been received by the state department.
Title
Abortion providers.
Sponsors
Sen. John Waterman [R] | Sen. James Banks [R] | Rep. Rhonda Rhoads [R] | Rep. Thomas Dermody [R] |
Rep. Peggy Mayfield [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Concur in House Amendments (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Floor - (Y: 89 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House Committee on Public Policy - Roll Call 029202 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 34 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health and Provider Services - Roll Call 029201 (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Floor - (Y: 89 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House Committee on Public Policy - Roll Call 029202 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 34 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health and Provider Services - Roll Call 029201 (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Public Law 98 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Motion to Concur in House Amendments: prevailed; Roll Call 371: yeas 34 and nays 6 |
2014-03-03 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2014-03-03 | House | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 357: yeas 89 and nays 9 |
2014-02-27 | House | Second reading: engrossed. |
2014-02-25 | House | Representative Mayfield added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-25 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-18 | House | Representative Dermody added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-18 | House | Representative Washburne added as sponsor. |
2014-02-18 | House | Representative Washburne removed as cosponsor. |
2014-02-18 | House | Representative Rhoads added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-18 | House | Representative Rhoads removed as sponsor. |
2014-02-10 | House | First Reading: Referred to Public Policy |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Representative Washburne added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Representative Rhoads added as sponsor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 174: yeas 34 and nays 14 |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-02-03 | Senate | SB 292 Amendment #1 (Breaux), failed. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Health and Provider Services |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Authored by Senator Waterman, Banks |