IN SB0291 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
Pending: House Public Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
Pending: House Public Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Law enforcement officers and handguns in a casino. Defines "licensed facility" to include gambling game facilities, satellite facilities, riverboats, and property that contains both a gambling game facility and a racetrack with live horse racing. Defines "law enforcement officer" to also include an off-duty law enforcement officer and a qualified retired law enforcement officer under 18 U.S.C. 926C. Requires the gaming commission (commission) to adopt rules: (1) permitting a law enforcement officer to carry a handgun in a licensed facility; (2) requiring a law enforcement officer who is carrying a handgun to notify an enforcement agent or the commission that the law enforcement officer is carrying a handgun; (3) requiring the licensed facility to provide the law enforcement officer with a wristband or other identifiable item that will inform the licensed facility and its agents that the law enforcement officer is carrying a handgun; and (4) implementing a reasonable method to enforce the new rules. Provides that the commission is not prohibited from adopting its own rules or policies concerning the carrying of handguns by its employees or enforcement agents.
Title
Law enforcement officers and handguns in a casino.
Sponsors
Sen. Ronald Grooms [R] | Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Sen. Jack Sandlin [R] | Sen. Jean Leising [R] |
Rep. Edward Clere [R] | Rep. Karen Engleman [R] | Rep. Sean Eberhart [R] | Rep. Terry Goodin [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senator Leising added as coauthor |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Engleman, Eberhart, Goodin |
2020-02-04 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Clere |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 157: yeas 40, nays 9 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Grooms) prevailed; voice vote |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Reread second time: amended, ordered engrossed |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Placed back on second reading |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Grooms) prevailed; Division of the Senate: yeas 39, nays 9 |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Senator Sandlin added as coauthor |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senator Koch added as second author |
2020-01-09 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Authored by Senator Grooms |