IN SB0291 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Public Law 139
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Public Law 139
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Industrial hemp. Removes provisions that: (1) allow a grower to retain seed from an industrial hemp crop for the following year; (2) exempt a grower from obtaining an agricultural hemp seed production license in order to retain seed for future planting; and (3) provide that seed retained by a grower may not be sold or transferred and is not required to meet the state seed commissioner's agricultural hemp seed standards.
Title
Industrial hemp. Removes provisions that: (1) allow a grower to retain seed from an industrial hemp crop for the following year; (2) exempt a grower from obtaining an agricultural hemp seed production license in order to retain seed for future planting; and (3) provide that seed retained by a grower may not be sold or transferred and is not required to meet the state seed commissioner's agricultural hemp seed standards.
Sponsors
Sen. Jean Leising [R] | Sen. Susan Glick [R] | Sen. Frank Mrvan [D] | Rep. Donald Lehe [R] |
Rep. Melanie Wright [D] | Rep. Sheila Klinker [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-16 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | Senate | Public Law 139 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-02-22 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2016-02-16 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2016-02-16 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 192: yeas 94, nays 1 |
2016-02-15 | House | Representative Klinker added as cosponsor |
2016-02-15 | House | Amendment #1 (Forestal) failed; voice vote |
2016-02-15 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-02-11 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2016-02-09 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Senator Mrvan added as coauthor |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Wright |
2016-02-01 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Lehe |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 102: yeas 49, nays 1 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Senator Glick added as second author |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2016-01-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Leising |